IL SB0647 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 24 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-21 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Administrative Act. Changes reference from the Andrew McFarland Mental Health Center to the Elizabeth Parsons Ware Packard Mental Health Center. Repeals the Perinatal Mental Health Disorders Prevention and Treatment Act. Amends the Maternal Mental Health Conditions Education, Early Diagnosis, and Treatment Act. Provides that Department of Human Services, in conjunction with the Department of Healthcare and Family Services, the Department of Public Health, and the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation and the Medical Licensing Board, shall work with birthing hospitals and licensed health care professionals in this State to develop policies, procedures, information, and educational materials to meet each of the following requirements concerning maternal mental health conditions: (1) licensed health care professionals providing prenatal care to women shall provide education to women and, if possible and with permission, to their families about maternal mental health conditions in accordance with the formal opinions and recommendations of the American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists; (2) all birthing hospitals shall provide new mothers, prior to discharge following childbirth, and, if possible, shall provide fathers and other family members with complete information about maternal mental health conditions, including its symptoms, methods of coping with the illness, treatment resources, post-hospital treatment options, and community resources; and (3) Licensed health care professionals providing prenatal care at a prenatal visit shall invite each pregnant patient to complete a questionnaire and shall review the completed questionnaire in accordance with the formal opinions and recommendations of the American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists. Provides that the Department of Human Services, in conjunction with the Department of Healthcare and Family Services, the Department of Public Health, and the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation, and the Medical Licensing Board shall develop educational materials for health care professionals (deletes patients) about maternal mental health conditions. Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Changes references from substance abuse to substance use disorder. Deletes references to drug abuse and addiction. Some provisions are effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HEALTH-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-24 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-21SenateSent to the Governor
2024-05-24SenatePassed Both Houses
2024-05-24SenateSenate Concurs
2024-05-24SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 058-000-000
2024-05-23SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Behavioral and Mental Health; 007-000-000
2024-05-23SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Behavioral and Mental Health
2024-05-23SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2024-05-23SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Adriane Johnson
2024-05-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 21, 2024
2024-05-21SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
2024-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2024-05-21HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
2024-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2024-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2024-05-17HouseThird Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
2024-05-16HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2024-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2024-05-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 008-000-000
2024-05-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2024-05-03HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2024-05-03HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2024-05-01HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2024-05-01HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled
2024-05-01HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
2024-04-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2024-04-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2024-04-15HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2024-04-11HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2024-04-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2024-04-11HouseFirst Reading
2024-04-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
2024-04-10HouseArrived in House
2024-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
2024-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2024-04-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2024-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2024-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2024-04-10SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2024-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Behavioral and Mental Health; 007-000-000
2024-04-09SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Adriane Johnson
2024-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Behavioral and Mental Health
2024-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2024-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson
2024-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2024
2024-03-20SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2023-05-11SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2023-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2023
2023-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), the following amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2023-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2023-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2023-03-31SenateRule 2-10(a) Third Reading Deadline Established As April 28, 2023
2023-03-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
2023-03-10SenateSecond Reading
2023-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
2023-03-09SenateDo Pass Executive; 011-000-000
2023-03-02SenateAssigned to Executive
2023-02-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2023-02-02SenateFirst Reading
2023-02-02SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40551-100Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=647&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103
Texthttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB0647.htm
Texthttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB0647eng.htm
Texthttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB0647enr.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB0647sam001.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB0647sam002.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB0647ham001.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB0647ham002.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/103/senate/10300SB0647_04102024_002000T.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/103/house/10300SB0647_05212024_003000T.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/103/senate/10300SB0647ham002_05242024_013000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback