MA S568 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2356

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to order a study on disparities in health care arising out of a change in marital status. Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To study disparities in health care resulting from changes in marital status

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-23SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2356
2015-05-29JointHearing scheduled for 06/03/2015 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

S2356 (Replaced by) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S254 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2221
S508 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S278 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2346
S2134 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2145 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2177 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Adopted, in concurrence
S1222 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - Accompanied H2007
S2089 (Similar To) 2016-01-11 - See H3684
S2439 (Similar To) -
S2440 (Similar To) -

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback