MA S2177 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-16 - Adopted, in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-16 - Adopted, in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to judicial matters.
Title
Judicial Matters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | House | Adopted, in concurrence |
2016-03-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Adopted |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S2134 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2145 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2204 (Similar To) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S812
S2384 (Similar To) 2016-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2439 (Similar To) -
S2440 (Similar To) -
S2145 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2204 (Similar To) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S812
S2384 (Similar To) 2016-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2439 (Similar To) -
S2440 (Similar To) -
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2177 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2177.pdf |