MA H3077 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4438

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the requirements for distinctive registration plates. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the requirements for distinctive registration plates

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-29HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4438
2015-11-24JointHearing scheduled for 12/03/2015 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
2015-01-20SenateSenate concurred
2015-01-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H4438 (Replaced by) 2016-06-29 - Reported, in part, by H3043
H124 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4623
H1566 (Similar To) 2016-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 174 of the Acts of 2016
H1567 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4370
H473 (Similar To) 2016-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H474 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4143
H4768 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 416 of the Acts of 2016

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback