MA S38 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2015 - 50% progression
Action: 2015-06-22 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the town of Barre. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the town of Barre

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-22HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2015-06-22HouseRules suspended
2015-06-22HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2015-06-15HouseRead; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2015-06-11SenateRead third and passed to be engrossed
2015-06-11SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2015-04-30SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2015-04-09SenateBill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2015-04-03JointHearing scheduled for 04/07/2015 from 12:00 PM-02:00 PM in B-2
2015-04-02HouseHouse concurred
2015-03-31SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S2082 (Similar To) 2015-12-28 - Reprinted as amended, see S2083
S2083 (Similar To) 2016-02-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 39 of the Acts of 2016
S1873 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2404 (Similar To) 2016-06-30 - See S2372
S1952 (Similar To) 2015-12-28 - New draft substituted, see S2082
S1724 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback