MA S137 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2357

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to protect consumers during a state of emergency. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting consumers during a state of emergency

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-23SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2357
2015-10-23JointHearing rescheduled to 10/27/2015 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in 437
2015-10-06JointHearing scheduled for 10/27/2015 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

S2357 (Replaced by) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S96 (Similar To) 2016-06-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2306
S92 (Similar To) 2015-10-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S998 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
S1559 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1259 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1223 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1113 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S488 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback