MA S92 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to require equal benefits for all new mothers. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring equal benefits for all new mothers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-10-05SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2015-07-23JointHearing scheduled for 07/28/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
2015-07-23JointHearing canceled – new hearing TBD
2015-07-20JointHearing scheduled for 07/28/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities

Same As/Similar To

S58 (Similar To) 2015-04-30 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 23) and placed on file
S1877 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1431 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1430 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S570 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1331 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S669 (Similar To) 2016-01-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2098
H2306 (Similar To) 2016-01-27 - Accompanied H3492
S1262 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1264 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1266 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback