MA S58 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 23) and placed on file
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 23) and placed on file
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to creating a progressive income tax. Revenue.
Title
Proposal for a legislative amendment to the Constitution Proposal for a legislative amendment to the constitution creating a progressive income tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 23) and placed on file |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S19 (Similar To) 2015-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S16 (Similar To) 2015-03-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2015
S60 (Similar To) 2015-04-30 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 23) and placed on file
S1455 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1561 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1458 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1447 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1412 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1542 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1517 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1421 (Similar To) 2016-12-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S59 (Similar To) 2015-04-30 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 23) and placed on file
S16 (Similar To) 2015-03-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2015
S60 (Similar To) 2015-04-30 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 23) and placed on file
S1455 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1561 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1458 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1447 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1412 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1542 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1517 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1421 (Similar To) 2016-12-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S59 (Similar To) 2015-04-30 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 23) and placed on file
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S58 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S58.pdf |