MA S1455 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2290
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the income tax deduction for charitable giving. Revenue.
Title
Relative to the income tax deduction for charitable giving
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-12 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2290 |
2015-06-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/30/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S2290 (Replaced by) 2016-05-12 - Reported in part by S1494
S1458 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1421 (Similar To) 2016-12-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1316 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1317 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S60 (Similar To) 2015-04-30 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 23) and placed on file
S1561 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1447 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S59 (Similar To) 2015-04-30 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 23) and placed on file
S1458 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1421 (Similar To) 2016-12-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1316 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1317 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S60 (Similar To) 2015-04-30 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 23) and placed on file
S1561 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1447 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S59 (Similar To) 2015-04-30 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 23) and placed on file
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1455 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1455.pdf |