CA SB1117 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 22 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-08-27 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on August 22 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-08-27 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 46003.2, 46004.1, 46013.1, 46013.2, 46016.1, 46016.3, 46016.4, 46017, 46018.1, 46020, 46021, 46022, 46027, and 46028 of, and to repeal Section 46003.5 of, the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to food and agriculture.
Title
Organic products.
Sponsors
Sen. John Laird [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-08-22 - Senate - Special Consent SB1117 Laird (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Assembly - SB 1117 Laird Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-08-07 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1117 Laird (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - [04-02-2024] set for [First] hearing: Reconsideration of favorable vote granted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Assembly - SB 1117 Laird Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-08-07 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1117 Laird (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - [04-02-2024] set for [First] hearing: Reconsideration of favorable vote granted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-27 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2024-08-22 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2024-08-20 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2024-08-15 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2024-08-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6320.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2024-08-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-08-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 7). |
2024-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2024-05-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2024-05-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3831.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3635.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3444.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | April 2 set for first hearing. Reconsideration of favorable vote granted. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on AGRI and JUD. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 46003.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 46003.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 46004.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 46013.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 46013.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 46016.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 46016.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 46016.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 46017 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 46018.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 46020 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 46021 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 46022 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 46027 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 46028 | Amended Code | Citation Text |