MA S1410 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2314

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide fairness and equity for Massachusetts Water Resource Authority employees. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for fairness and equity for Massachusetts Water Resources Authority employees

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-06SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2314
2016-01-14JointHearing scheduled for 01/26/2016 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S2314 (Replaced by) 2016-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1354 (Similar To) 2016-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1266 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
H2306 (Similar To) 2016-01-27 - Accompanied H3492
H2264 (Similar To) 2016-10-06 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
S302 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2336
S2119 (Similar To) 2016-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 177 of the Acts of 2016

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback