MA S1338 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2314

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to clarify a police chief's retirement earnings limitation. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarifying a police chief's retirement earnings limitation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-06SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2314
2016-01-05JointHearing scheduled for 01/12/2016 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S2314 (Replaced by) 2016-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1941 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 47 of the Acts of 2016
S2189 (Similar To) 2016-09-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 262 of the Acts of 2016
S2476 (Similar To) 2016-07-28 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1789 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2366
H3517 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback