MA H3517 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4102
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit the evaluation of contractors with the Division of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance prior to completion of the project. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to the evaluation of contractors with the Division of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D] | Rep. Mary Keefe [D] | Sen. Barbara L'Italien [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] |
Sen. Linda Forry [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4102 |
2015-09-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/06/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in 437 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H4102 (Replaced by) 2016-04-07 - Reported, in part, by H3889
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3517 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3517.pdf |