MA H1671 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4706

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to increase the penalties for the distributing and trafficking of oxycodone and derivatives of oxycodone. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To increase penalties for distribution of oxycodone

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-10-24HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4706
2015-06-03JointHearing scheduled for 06/09/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2015-01-20SenateSenate concurred
2015-01-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H4706 (Replaced by) 2016-10-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2197 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
H1658 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1659 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H1876 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1660 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback