MA H1876 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-04-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to residential building lots. Municipalities and Regional Government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To protect residential building lots

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-21HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2016-04-21HouseRules suspended
2016-04-21HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2016-03-23HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2015-09-09JointHearing scheduled for 09/17/2015 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2
2015-01-20SenateSenate concurred
2015-01-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

H2197 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
H1658 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1659 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H1660 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1661 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback