MA H2197 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4611
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize licensed, qualified retired law enforcement officers to carry firearms on the grounds of any elementary school, secondary school, college or university. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
To promote school safety
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Whelan [R] | Rep. Shawn Dooley [R] | Rep. Todd Smola [R] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] |
Rep. Keiko Orrall [R] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] | Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-15 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4611 |
2015-11-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/02/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H4611 (Replaced by) 2016-09-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1658 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1659 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H1876 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1660 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1661 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1658 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1659 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H1876 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1660 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1661 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2197 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2197.pdf |