MA H4293 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 240 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 240 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the conveyance of a certain parcel of state owned land on East First Street in the South Boston neighborhood of the city of Boston. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Conveying a certain parcel of land on East First Street in the South Boston section of the City of Boston
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-11 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 240 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2016-08-01 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2016-07-31 | Senate | Enacted -see Roll Call #677 [Yeas 38 to Nays 0] |
2016-07-31 | House | Enacted 158 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 555) |
2016-07-31 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2016-07-31 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2016-07-31 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-07-31 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2016-07-15 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-07-14 | House | Read third (title changed), amended and passed to be engrossed |
2016-07-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-07-11 | House | Amendment adopted (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means), ordered to a third reading |
2016-07-11 | House | Motion to reconsider prevailed |
2016-07-07 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading with the amendment pending |
2016-07-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-07-07 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment pending |
2016-07-05 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2016-06-27 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-06-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday, June 22, 2016, pending concurrence |
2016-05-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/01/2016 from 11:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-05-09 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2016-05-05 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4293 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4293.pdf |