MA S701 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2383
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to 40B project lists. Housing.
Title
Relating to 40B project lists
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-05 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2383 |
2016-01-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/02/2016 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
S2383 (Replaced by) 2016-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S702 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S113 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2145
S705 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S704 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S112 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2145
S1700 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S718 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S1744 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1576 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1575 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S769 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S702 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S113 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2145
S705 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S704 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S112 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2145
S1700 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S718 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S1744 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1576 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1575 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S769 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S701 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S701.pdf |