MA S600 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2356
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide financial relief to long term care facilitiesrequired to obtain criminal offender record informationfor potential employees. Health Care Financing.
Title
Relative to payment for long term care workers CORIs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-23 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2356 |
2015-06-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/01/2015 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S2356 (Replaced by) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S526 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S739 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S699 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S1287 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1198 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1412 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S594 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - New draft substituted as amended, see S2140
S667 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
S489 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S526 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S739 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S699 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S1287 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1198 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1412 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S594 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - New draft substituted as amended, see S2140
S667 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
S489 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S600 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S600.pdf |