MA S1910 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4083

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4083
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to exempt veterans from the payment of fees for use of recreational facilities under the jurisdiction of the Department of Conservation and Recreation. Veterans and Federal Affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to veterans

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-16HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4083
2015-06-17JointHearing scheduled for 07/14/2015 from 12:30 PM-01:30 PM in Battleship Cove
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs

Same As/Similar To

H4083 (Replaced by) 2016-03-16 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1744 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S575 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1367 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1832 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S739 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S699 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S1417 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1905 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4083

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback