MA S229 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2215

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2215
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to a restaurant and hotel community reinvestment program. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to a restaurant and hotel community reinvestment program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-07SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2215
2015-06-02JointHearing scheduled for 06/10/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies

Same As/Similar To

S2215 (Replaced by) 2016-04-14 - Reported in part by S224
S1849 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S125 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2244
S1184 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1227 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2187
S2187 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2244 (Similar To) 2017-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 447 of the Acts of 2016

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback