MA S421 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2380

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to further regulate the capturing of furbearing animals. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Valuing our natural resources

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-05SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2380
2015-11-02JointHearing scheduled for 11/10/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Division of Fisheries and Wildlife
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture

Same As/Similar To

S2380 (Replaced by) 2016-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1828 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S743 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
H242 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
S1220 (Similar To) 2016-07-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2468
S616 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1323 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1801 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2361
S1308 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1759 (Similar To) 2016-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2274
S1363 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback