MA S1801 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2361

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2361
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the treatment of elephants. Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the treatment of elephants

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-23SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2361
2016-03-16HouseHouse concurred
2016-03-16SenateReporting date extended to Monday May 2, 2016, pending concurrence
2015-10-15JointHearing scheduled for 10/21/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 and A-2
2015-06-24HouseHouse concurred
2015-06-22SenateDischarged to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development

Same As/Similar To

S2361 (Replaced by) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1706 (Similar To) 2015-11-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2056
S1626 (Similar To) 2016-11-10 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1274 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
S786 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S159 (Similar To) 2015-12-03 - Accompanied H199
S439 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
H713 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S682 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback