MA S1241 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to improve data collection in the juvenile justice system. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Improving juvenile justice data collection
Sponsors
Sen. Cynthia Creem [D] | Rep. Ruth Balser [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] |
Rep. Marcos Devers [D] | Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S1124 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4039
H82 (Similar To) 2016-01-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S76 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Accompanied H82
S2417 (Similar To) 2016-07-12 - Reprinted as amended, see S2424
H83 (Similar To) 2015-10-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H82 (Similar To) 2016-01-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S76 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Accompanied H82
S2417 (Similar To) 2016-07-12 - Reprinted as amended, see S2424
H83 (Similar To) 2015-10-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1241 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1241.pdf |