MA H4466 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4692
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4692
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4692
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to fines and punishment for committing assault or assault and battery on law enforcement officers while in the performance of their duties. The Judiciary.
Title
Protecting police officers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4692 |
2016-07-12 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 07/13/2016 from 09:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2 |
2016-07-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2016 from 09:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-1 |
2016-07-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-06-30 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on the Judiciary |
2016-06-29 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4692 (Replaced by) 2016-10-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1305 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1306 (Similar To) 2015-11-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 129 of the Acts of 2015
H2509 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2876 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H2507 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1305 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1306 (Similar To) 2015-11-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 129 of the Acts of 2015
H2509 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2876 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H2507 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4466 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4466.pdf |