MA S1914 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to update veterans’ burial expenses. Veterans and Federal Affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Updating veterans’ burial expenses

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-24SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2015-11-18JointHearing rescheduled to 11/18/2015 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in 222
2015-11-10JointHearing scheduled for 11/18/2015 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs

Same As/Similar To

S1423 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1415 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1746 (Similar To) 2016-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1282 (Similar To) 2016-01-27 - Accompanied H2161
S1414 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1905 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4083
S984 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1823 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S411 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2171
S1606 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1340 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1335 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1796 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2388
S575 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1367 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S571 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback