MA S1340 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to age restrictions for veterans applying to be police officers and firefighters. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to age restrictions for veterans applying to be police officers and firefighters

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-12-19SenateOught NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2016-03-17HouseHouse concurred
2016-03-16SenateDischarged to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs
2015-05-04JointHearing scheduled for 05/12/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S1342 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1285 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1214 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1216 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1905 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4083
S984 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1423 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1823 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S411 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2171
S1335 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1796 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2388
S1414 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S575 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1367 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S571 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback