MA S1214 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2199

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to medical malpractice. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to medical malpractice

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-28SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2199
2015-11-09JointHearing scheduled for 11/17/2015 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

S2199 (Replaced by) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S1231
S2399 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1097 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
H195 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
S1825 (Similar To) 2015-10-15 - Accompanied H3101
S1205 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2148
S1896 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S235 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2215
S630 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S377 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
S343 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2150

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback