MA S1205 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2148

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2148
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a board of registration in naturopathy. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a board of registration in naturopathy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-29SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2148
2015-11-09JointHearing scheduled for 11/17/2015 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

S2148 (Replaced by) 2016-06-13 - New draft substituted, see S2335
S1158 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1091 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H195 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
S1192 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S2377 (Similar To) 2016-12-15 - Ordered to a third reading
H2003 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H220 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4452

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback