MA S2377 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4766

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-15 - Ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

SENATE, Monday, June 27, 2016 - The committee on Ways and Means, to whom was referred the Senate Bill providing consumers with equal protection for all real estate appraisals (Senate, No. 131),-- reports, recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment substituting a new draft with the same title (Senate, No. 2377).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing consumers with equal protection for all real estate appraisals

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-12-15HouseOrdered to a third reading
2016-12-15HouseAmendment adopted (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means), see H4766
2016-12-15HouseRead second
2016-12-15HouseRules suspended
2016-12-15HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending
2016-12-15HouseReferred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending
2016-12-15HouseCommittee recommended ought to pass, striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of an amendment, H4766
2016-06-29HouseRead; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2016-06-27SenateRead third and passed to be engrossed
2016-06-27SenateOrdered to a third reading
2016-06-27SenateSubstituted as a new draft for S131
2016-06-27SenateRules suspended
2016-06-27SenateRecommended new draft S131
2016-06-27SenateReported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

S2141 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Reprinted as amended, see S2168
S2153 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2409 (Similar To) 2016-07-14 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2467 (Similar To) 2016-07-27 - Recommended new draft for S71
S2307 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4766 (Replaced by) 2016-12-15 - Text of an amendment, see S2377
S1361 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1285 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S584 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1212 (Similar To) 2015-08-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1993
S1881 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S128 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
S1218 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2149
S407 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S1153 (Similar To) 2015-12-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3911
S146 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2230
S972 (Similar To) 2015-06-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S437 (Similar To) 2015-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S640 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1236 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S401 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback