MA S401 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-24 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-24 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide for an investigation and study of enhancing statewide recycling programs. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Resolve providing for an investigation and study of enhancing statewide recycling programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | Senate | Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2015-06-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/23/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S276 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2338
S399 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S1553 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S407 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S1073 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1074 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2310 (Similar To) 2016-06-13 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1549 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S398 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
H814 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4621
H734 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2923 (Similar To) 2015-12-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S399 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S1553 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S407 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S1073 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1074 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2310 (Similar To) 2016-06-13 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1549 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S398 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
H814 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4621
H734 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2923 (Similar To) 2015-12-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S401 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S401.pdf |