MA S2307 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1048
Note: Replaces legislation S2279
Note: Replaces legislation S2279
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on June 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote transparency and cost control of pharmaceutical drug prices; and Senate bill relative to female genital mutilation of minors (Senate, No. 2279), report the accompanying Order (Senate, No. 2307).
Title
Financing and Delivery of Health Care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Senate | Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Order reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Accompanied by S1048 and S2279 |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S1048 (Replaces) 2016-06-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2307
S2279 (Replaces) 2016-06-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2307
S2306 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2261 (Similar To) 2016-05-02 - Adopted, in concurrence
S2382 (Similar To) 2016-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4440 (Similar To) 2016-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4692
H4234 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2279 (Replaces) 2016-06-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2307
S2306 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2261 (Similar To) 2016-05-02 - Adopted, in concurrence
S2382 (Similar To) 2016-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4440 (Similar To) 2016-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4692
H4234 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2307 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2307.pdf |