MA S1048 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2307
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2307
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2307
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote transparency and cost control of pharmaceutical drug prices. Mental Health and Substance Abuse.
Title
To promote transparency and cost control of pharmaceutical drug prices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-02 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2307 |
2016-05-02 | House | Adopted, in concurrence |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 1, 2016, pending concurrence |
2016-03-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/11/2016 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2016-03-16 | Joint | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD |
2016-02-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/22/2016 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2015-09-14 | House | House concurred |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health and Substance Abuse |
Same As/Similar To
S2307 (Replaced by) 2016-06-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1219 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S537 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S541 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S603 (Similar To) 2015-10-01 - Substituted by S2022, amended
S2010 (Similar To) 2015-10-01 - Substituted by S2020, amended
S1477 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1107 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
S422 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S455 (Similar To) 2015-10-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1000 (Similar To) 2016-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4604
S1219 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S537 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S541 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S603 (Similar To) 2015-10-01 - Substituted by S2022, amended
S2010 (Similar To) 2015-10-01 - Substituted by S2020, amended
S1477 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1107 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
S422 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S455 (Similar To) 2015-10-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1000 (Similar To) 2016-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4604
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1048 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1048.pdf |