MA S603 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2010
Note: Legislation replaced by S2020

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-10-01 - Substituted by S2022, amended
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to improve the accessibility and affordability of naloxone and other pharmaceutical drugs of public health concern. Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To improve the accessibility and affordability of naloxone and other pharmaceutical drugs of public health concern

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-10-01SenateSubstituted by S2022, amended
2015-09-28SenatePlaced in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, October 1, 2015
2015-09-28SenateCommittee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2020
2015-09-24SenateOrder relative to subject matter adopted
2015-09-10SenateReferred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2015-09-10SenateRead second
2015-09-10SenateRules suspended
2015-09-10SenateCommittee recommended that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session with an amendment, substituting thereof a new draft, see S2010
2015-07-20SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
2015-06-19JointHearing scheduled for 06/24/2015 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

S2010 (Replaced by) 2015-10-01 - Substituted by S2020, amended
S2020 (Replaced by) 2015-10-01 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #173 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
S1230 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S649 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1672 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1136 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S2138 (Similar To) 2016-12-27 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S1565 (Similar To) 2015-07-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3639
H81 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4614
H82 (Similar To) 2016-01-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3281 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback