MA H3281 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4367

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

That the town of Andover be authorized to issue health insurance benefits to certain elected officials of said town. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to health insurance benefits for elected officials in the town of Andover

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-09HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4367
2015-07-07JointHearing scheduled for 07/21/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2015-01-20SenateSenate concurred
2015-01-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H4367 (Replaced by) 2016-06-09 - Reported, in part, by H4012
H104 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H105 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H431 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4600
H579 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H1054 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4228

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback