MA H81 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4614

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4614
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to include persons with disabilities under the Health Disparities Council. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to health disparities council

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-19HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4614
2016-03-24HouseReported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2016-01-28JointHearing scheduled for 02/09/2016 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2015-01-20SenateSenate concurred
2015-01-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities

Same As/Similar To

H4614 (Replaced by) 2016-09-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H350 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4599
H352 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4601
H2490 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1267 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H181 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback