MA S1230 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2199

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish an advisory committee on the accessibility of fresh food retail in communities throughout the Commonwealth. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolve establishing an advisory committee on the accessibility of fresh food retail in communities throughout the Commonwealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-28SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2199
2015-09-10JointHearing scheduled for 09/17/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

S2199 (Replaced by) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S1231
S1565 (Similar To) 2015-07-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3639
S603 (Similar To) 2015-10-01 - Substituted by S2022, amended
S649 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1672 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1136 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback