MA S649 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2356

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to promote the accessibility, quality and continuity of care for consumers of behavioral health, substance use disorder and mental health services. Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To promote the accessibility, quality and continuity of care for consumers of behavioral health, substance use disorder and mental health services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-23SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2356
2015-06-19JointHearing scheduled for 06/24/2015 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

S2356 (Replaced by) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1136 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S2081 (Similar To) 2016-02-25 - New draft substituted as amended, see S2138
S2138 (Similar To) 2016-12-27 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S1644 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1694 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S536 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2232
S603 (Similar To) 2015-10-01 - Substituted by S2022, amended

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback