MA S2020 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Replaces legislation S603
Note: Replaces legislation S2022

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 1 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-10-01 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #173 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to substance use prevention” (Senate, No. 2020) [Estimated cost: $1,200,000] (Senator Keenan dissenting)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to substance use prevention

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-10-01SenatePassed to be engrossed - Roll Call #173 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
2015-10-01SenateReprinted as amended, see S2022
2015-10-01SenateRead third
2015-10-01SenateOrdered to a third reading
2015-10-01SenateSubstituted new draft for S603
2015-10-01SenateSubstituted as a new draft for S2010
2015-10-01SenateWays and Means amendment adopted, as amended
2015-10-01SenateAmendment #42 (Spilka) adopted
2015-10-01SenateAmendment #41 (Wolf) adopted
2015-10-01SenateAmendment #39 (Tarr) adopted
2015-10-01SenateAmendment #34 (Keenan) adopted
2015-10-01SenateAmendment #33 (Hedlund) adopted
2015-10-01SenateAmendment #7 (Brownsberger) adopted, as amended
2015-10-01SenateFurther amendment #7.1 (Flanagan) adopted
2015-10-01SenateAmendment #7 (Brownsberger) pending
2015-10-01SenateAmendment #24 (Rodrigues) adopted
2015-10-01SenateAmendment #21 (Brownsberger) adopted
2015-10-01SenateAmendment #19 (Lesser) adopted
2015-10-01SenateAmendment #17 (Donoghue) adopted
2015-10-01SenateAmendment #12 (Moore) adopted
2015-10-01SenateAmendment #11 (Moore) adopted
2015-10-01SenateAmendment #8 (Brownsberger) adopted
2015-10-01SenateAmendment #6 (Brownsberger) rejected
2015-10-01SenateAmendment #1 (deMacedo) adopted
2015-10-01SenateAmendment #44 (Tarr) rejected
2015-10-01SenateAmendment #43 (Tarr) rejected
2015-10-01SenateAmendment #40 (Tarr) adopted, as amended
2015-10-01SenateFurther amendment #40.1 (Joyce) adopted
2015-10-01SenateAmendment #40 (Tarr) pending
2015-10-01SenateAmendment #38 (Chandler) adopted - Roll Call #172 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
2015-10-01SenateAmendment #37 (Tarr) adopted
2015-10-01SenateAmendment #35 (Lovely) rejected
2015-10-01SenateAmendment #32 (O'Connor Ives) rejected
2015-10-01SenateAmendment #31 (Tarr) adopted - Roll Call #171 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
2015-10-01SenateAmendment #30 (Hedlund) rejected
2015-10-01SenateAmendment #25 (Moore) adopted
2015-10-01SenateAmendment #23 (O'Connor Ives) adopted
2015-10-01SenateAmendment #22 (O'Connor Ives) rejected - Roll Call #170 [YEAS 11 - NAYS 27]
2015-10-01SenateAmendment #16 (Donoghue) rejected
2015-10-01SenateAmendment #18 (Donoghue) rejected
2015-10-01SenateAmendment #16 (Donoghue) rejected
2015-10-01SenateAmendment #15 (Donoghue) adopted
2015-10-01SenateAmendment #13 (Creem) adopted
2015-10-01SenateAmendment #5 (Joyce) rejected - Roll Call #169 [YEAS 10 - NAYS 27]
2015-10-01SenateAmendment #4 (Joyce) adopted
2015-10-01SenateAmendment #2 (Lovely) rejected
2015-09-28SenatePlaced in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, October 1, 2015
2015-09-28SenateRecommended new draft of S603
2015-09-28SenateReported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

S603 (Replaces) 2015-10-01 - Substituted by S2022, amended
S2022 (Replaces) 2015-11-12 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S284 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S976 (Similar To) 2016-05-31 - Accompanied H3849
S2324 (Similar To) 2016-06-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S820 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1157 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S251 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S99 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
S778 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1210 (Similar To) 2016-07-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2411

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback