MA S2022 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on October 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to substance use prevention (Senate, No. 2022) (being the text of Senate, No. 2020, printed as amended)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to substance use prevention

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2015-11-12HouseCommittee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2015-10-05HouseRead; and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
2015-10-05SenatePassed to be engrossed - Roll Call #173 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
2015-10-05SenateText of S2020, printed as amended

Same As/Similar To

S976 (Similar To) 2016-05-31 - Accompanied H3849
S284 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S2020 (Similar To) 2015-10-01 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #173 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
S2434 (Similar To) 2016-07-18 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S778 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1210 (Similar To) 2016-07-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2411
H1616 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback