MA S2324 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Edward Connors, an employee of the Department of Transitional Assistance. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a sick leave bank for Edward Connors, an employee of the Department of Transitional Assistance

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-13SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2016-06-08HouseHouse concurred
2016-05-05SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service
2016-05-05SenateRules suspended
2016-04-19SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently

Same As/Similar To

S2027 (Similar To) 2015-10-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2452 (Similar To) 2016-08-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 246 of the Acts of 2016
S1757 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2029 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - New draft substituted, see S2043
S2185 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Adopted, in concurrence
H1368 (Similar To) 2015-04-06 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S25 (Similar To) 2015-04-01 - Accompanied S39
S14 (Similar To) 2015-02-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S15
H2281 (Similar To) 2015-05-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 28 of the Acts of 2015
S1330 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S10 (Similar To) 2015-03-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 6 of the Acts of 2015
S1441 (Similar To) 2015-04-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1261 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1372 (Similar To) 2016-07-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1336 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - Accompanied H3285
S1341 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1896 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback