MA S14 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S15
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Audrey Graham Smith, an employee of the Executive Office of Health and Human Services. Senate Ways and Means.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Audrey Graham Smith, an employee of the Executive Office of Health and Human Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-23 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S15 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H1368 (Similar To) 2015-04-06 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2281 (Similar To) 2015-05-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 28 of the Acts of 2015
S1925 (Similar To) 2015-05-14 - See H51
S1998 (Similar To) 2015-11-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 121 of the Acts of 2015
S15 (Replaced by) 2015-03-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2015
H2281 (Similar To) 2015-05-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 28 of the Acts of 2015
S1925 (Similar To) 2015-05-14 - See H51
S1998 (Similar To) 2015-11-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 121 of the Acts of 2015
S15 (Replaced by) 2015-03-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2015
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S14 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S14.pdf |