MA S1757 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to clean energy resources. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to clean energy resources
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-19 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-03-16 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday July 1, 2016, pending concurrence |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S1760 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1783 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets
S1686 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2986 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4243
H2938 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
H3332 (Similar To) 2015-03-30 - New text for H3203
H3968 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 385 of the Acts of 2016
S1783 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets
S1686 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2986 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4243
H2938 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
H3332 (Similar To) 2015-03-30 - New text for H3203
H3968 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 385 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1757 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1757.pdf |