MA S1477 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2290

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to improve the earned income credit for working families. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Improving the earned income credit for working families

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-12SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2290
2015-05-05JointHearing scheduled for 05/05/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

S2290 (Replaced by) 2016-05-12 - Reported in part by S1494
S676 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2099
H1036 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied S570
H1066 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2099
S1458 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S397 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Accompanied H696

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback