IL SB3455 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
Pending: House Revenue & Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
Pending: House Revenue & Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill. Provides that the Department of Revenue may determine the scope of the historical data necessary to complete the study, but in no event shall the scope or time period be less than the 10 most recent tax years for which the Department has complete data. Provides that the study need not be limited to certain specified factors. Removes provisions from the introduced bill providing that the study shall include an analysis of the use of technology in data collection. Provides that the Department of Revenue may (in the introduced bill, shall) consult with Illinois institutions of higher education in conducting the study. Provides that the Department of Revenue may also consult with units of local government. Makes other changes.
Title
IDOR-PROP TX STUDY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci |
2024-04-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-12 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty |
2024-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Seth Lewis |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Erica Harriss |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 009-000-000 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 22, 2024 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 009-000-000 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick |