MA S2409 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 13 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-14 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 13 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-14 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to family financial protection (Senate, No. 2230),-- reports, recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment substituting a new draft with the same title (Senate, No. 2409).
Title
Relative to family financial protection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-14 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #406 [Yeas 29 to Nay 9] |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Read third |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Ways and Means amendment adopted, as amended |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Eldridge) adopted |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Tarr) rejected -see Roll Call #405 [Yeas 9 to Nays 30] |
2016-07-07 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Tuesday, July 12, 2016 |
2016-07-07 | Senate | Recommended new draft for S2230 |
2016-07-07 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S2446 (Similar To) 2016-07-30 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2477
S834 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4107
S146 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2230
S1008 (Similar To) 2016-05-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4351
S2230 (Similar To) 2016-07-13 - New draft substituted, see S2409
S624 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S962 (Similar To) 2015-10-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2034
H79 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4117
H2892 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H442 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4299
S834 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4107
S146 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2230
S1008 (Similar To) 2016-05-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4351
S2230 (Similar To) 2016-07-13 - New draft substituted, see S2409
S624 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S962 (Similar To) 2015-10-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2034
H79 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4117
H2892 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H442 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4299
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2409 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2409.pdf |