MA S343 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2150

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2150
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the modernization of boat registration and marine vessels. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the modernization of boat registration and marine vessels

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-29SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2150
2015-09-25JointHearing scheduled for 09/29/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2015-05-12HouseHouse concurred
2015-05-11SenateDischarged to the Joint Committee on Revenue
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

S2150 (Replaced by) 2016-02-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S235 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2215
S193 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
S918 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1578 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1602 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2150
H195 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
S1825 (Similar To) 2015-10-15 - Accompanied H3101
S1486 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1214 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1205 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2148

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback