MA S235 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2215

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2215
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to study the feasibility of streamlining business registration. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To study the feasibility of streamlining business registration

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-07SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2215
2015-04-22JointHearing scheduled for 04/29/2015 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in B-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies

Same As/Similar To

S2215 (Replaced by) 2016-04-14 - Reported in part by S224
S193 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
S918 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1578 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S343 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2150
S146 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2230
H195 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
S1825 (Similar To) 2015-10-15 - Accompanied H3101
S1214 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1205 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2148
S1896 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback