MA S1097 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2385

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to annual reports of cities and towns. Municipalities and Regional Government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to annual reports of cities and towns

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-05SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2385
2015-12-03JointHearing scheduled for 12/10/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

S2385 (Replaced by) 2016-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1098 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
S1685 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1582 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1525 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1593 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback