MA S377 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4134

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish election day registration. Election Laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing election day registration

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-30HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4134
2016-01-14JointHearing scheduled for 01/19/2016 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

H4134 (Replaced by) 2016-04-06 - Reported, in part, by H3359
S301 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2345
S314 (Similar To) 2016-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2328
H195 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
S1825 (Similar To) 2015-10-15 - Accompanied H3101
S1214 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1205 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2148
S1896 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S775 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1158 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S82 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2382
S1716 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback